THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:05:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 07 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: see above
Patients can contact Dr. Carolyn Best cpso# 81149 (please see the cpso website for her contacat information at www.cpso.on.ca
She has taken over Dr. Kalbfleisch's practice.
Date Received: 11 Feb 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 07 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: see above
Patients can contact Dr. Carolyn Best cpso# 81149 (please see the cpso website for her contacat information at www.cpso.on.ca
She has taken over Dr. Kalbfleisch's practice.
Date Received: 11 Feb 2014

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1978