THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 05:05:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 149 College Street
Toronto Ontario M4W 3W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-978-1662
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 25 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 24 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 149 College Street
Toronto Ontario M4W 3W5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-978-1662
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 25 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 24 Nov 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEE EDWARD ERRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERRETT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LEE EDWARD ERRETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ERRETT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1994
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 06 Dec 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 1994

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 06 Dec 1985

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1977