THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:21:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1976
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact Woburn Medical Dental Centre at: 4129 Lawrence Avenue East, Scarborough, ON, M1E 2S2, or via telephone: 416-439-1991, or via Fax: 416-439-3593.
Date Received: 11 Feb 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HUNGARIAN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may contact Woburn Medical Dental Centre at: 4129 Lawrence Avenue East, Scarborough, ON, M1E 2S2, or via telephone: 416-439-1991, or via Fax: 416-439-3593.
Date Received: 11 Feb 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 16 Jul 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Iidiko Mary Sajo to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 16, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Sajo engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in her family medicine practice. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Sajo resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 16 Jul 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Iidiko Mary Sajo to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 16, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Sajo engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in her family medicine practice. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Sajo resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 14 Mar 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1982
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 28 Jan 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 14 Mar 2019


DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Dec 1982

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 1982

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Oct 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1976