THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:00:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Dr. Kevin Ali
Suite 104
125 Bell Farm Rd
Barrie ON L4N 6L2
Date Received: 03 Jun 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Doorly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Dr. Kevin Ali
Suite 104
125 Bell Farm Rd
Barrie ON L4N 6L2
Date Received: 03 Jun 2021

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Patrick Doorly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 31 Jul 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Oct 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1978