THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:37:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1971
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 13 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Landecker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Oct 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS, GERMAN
Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 13 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Landecker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 08 Oct 2023

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On November 1, 2011, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Newmarket, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Landecker.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On November 1, 2011, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Newmarket, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Landecker.

Training

Medical School: University of Cape Town Faculty of Health Sciences, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Member Deceased Effective: 07 Jul 2023
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
DETAILS: Expired: Member Deceased
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1976