THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:08:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 24 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients who wish to obtain their medical record may send a letter to 7-1275 Walker Road, Windsor, ON, N8Y 4X9
Date Received: 07 Jun 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Bacchus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Oct 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 24 Nov 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients who wish to obtain their medical record may send a letter to 7-1275 Walker Road, Windsor, ON, N8Y 4X9
Date Received: 07 Jun 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Bacchus Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Oct 2018

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the West Indies, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 14 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1977
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2019


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1977