THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:05:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Wellington Road South
Unit 1
London Ontario N6C 4M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 438-6067
Fax: 519 438-3689
Address: 188 Victoria Street
London Ontario N6A 2B8
Phone: (519) 435-1733
Fax: (519) 435-1259

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health
LOCATION: London

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Wellington Road South
Unit 1
London Ontario N6C 4M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 438-6067
Fax: 519 438-3689
Address: 188 Victoria Street
London Ontario N6A 2B8
Phone: (519) 435-1733
Fax: (519) 435-1259

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jan 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: London

HOSPITAL: St Joseph Health Care London - Mental Health
LOCATION: London

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
29 Mar 2014
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 29 2014
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon




As from March 29, 2014, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Michael Milo, in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Milo to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Milo has relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to the
following drugs, substances and preparations set out in the corresponding
regulations, as amended from time to time, and summarized as follows:


Narcotic Drugs
(from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs
and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19) Relinquished

Narcotic Preparations
(from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs
and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19) Relinquished

Controlled Drugs
(from Schedule G of the Regulations
under the Food and Drugs
Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27) Not Relinquished

Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
(from the Benzodiazepines and Other
Targeted Substances Regulations made
under the Controlled Drugs and
Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19) Not Relinquished

All Other Monitored Drugs
(as defined under the Narcotic
Safety and Awareness Act, S.O.
2010, c. 22) Not Relinquished

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon




As from March 29, 2014, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Michael Milo, in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Milo to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Milo has relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to the
following drugs, substances and preparations set out in the corresponding
regulations, as amended from time to time, and summarized as follows:


Narcotic Drugs
(from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs
and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19) Relinquished

Narcotic Preparations
(from the Narcotic Control Regulations
made under the Controlled Drugs
and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19) Relinquished

Controlled Drugs
(from Schedule G of the Regulations
under the Food and Drugs
Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27) Not Relinquished

Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
(from the Benzodiazepines and Other
Targeted Substances Regulations made
under the Controlled Drugs and
Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19) Not Relinquished

All Other Monitored Drugs
(as defined under the Narcotic
Safety and Awareness Act, S.O.
2010, c. 22) Not Relinquished

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 29 Mar 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 1979