THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:51:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-4530
Fax: (905) 813-4548

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eric Letovsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Letovsky (CPSO#: 31299 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 813-4530
Fax: (905) 813-4548

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 18 Nov 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1985
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 18 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Eric Letovsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Feb 2007
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Letovsky (CPSO#: 31299 )
Business Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC LETOVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LETOVSKY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ERIC LETOVSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LETOVSKY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 1980

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1978