THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:30:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1976
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Maryville Family and Adolescent Centre
3640 Wells Ave
Windsor ON N9C 1T9
Date Received: 03 May 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tamison Doey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Apr 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2006
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2006
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Maryville Family and Adolescent Centre
3640 Wells Ave
Windsor ON N9C 1T9
Date Received: 03 May 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Tamison Doey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Apr 2017

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 28 Feb 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Tamison Marie Doey to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 28, 2017:

The College received information about Dr. Doey’s standard of practice, arising from an assessment of her practice. As a result of the assessment, Dr. Doey was required to complete professional education in mental health law.

Prior to completing the professional education, Dr. Doey ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 28 Feb 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Tamison Marie Doey to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 28, 2017:

The College received information about Dr. Doey’s standard of practice, arising from an assessment of her practice. As a result of the assessment, Dr. Doey was required to complete professional education in mental health law.

Prior to completing the professional education, Dr. Doey ceased to practise medicine in all jurisdictions and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 28 Feb 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jun 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 28 Feb 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 1980

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1979

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 1978

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1976