THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 03:35:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 70 University Ave
Suite 120
Toronto ON M5J 2M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 624 5171
Fax: 855 607 3858

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 20 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.K.W. Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Jan 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 70 University Ave
Suite 120
Toronto ON M5J 2M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647 624 5171
Fax: 855 607 3858

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 20 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network: Toronto Western Hospital and Toronto General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.K.W. Marshall Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 Jan 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH WAYNE MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KENNETH WAYNE MARSHALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARSHALL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Mar 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Mar 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 1977