THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:15:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.T. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Dec 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K.T. Lee Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Dec 2020

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 12 Feb 1990
Summary of Decision:
In the course of a Hearing which began in November 1989, Dr. Lee pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and in February 1990 found Dr. Lee guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Lee be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, and that his licence to practice be suspended for a period of one month.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 24 Nov 1989

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 12 Feb 1990
Summary of Decision:
In the course of a Hearing which began in November 1989, Dr. Lee pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in s. 60(3)(a) of the Health Disciplines Act, 1980, as amended, in that he had been found guilty of an offence relevant to his suitability to practice. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and in February 1990 found Dr. Lee guilty of professional misconduct. Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Lee be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on the Register, and that his licence to practice be suspended for a period of one month.
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 24 Nov 1989

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Member Deceased Effective: 14 Sep 2020
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 27 Jan 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1978
DETAILS: Expired: Member Deceased
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 27 Jan 1990


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 1978