THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:45:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1963
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 20 Nov 1969
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1969
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 20 Nov 1969
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1969
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (3)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 04 Sep 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Harry Sander Himal to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 4, 2024:
 
Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Himal’s general surgery practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Himal will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for three months.

Dr. Himal will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping, in appropriate testing and follow-up for patients with gastrointestinal complaints, and in appropriate triaging of patients for sigmoidoscopy and colonoscopy.

Dr. Himal’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and the completion of the professional education.


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Sep 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:


Source: Member
Effective Date: 01 Sep 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Harry Sander Himal to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective September 1, 2016:

Dr. Himal was the subject of Specified Continuing Education Program. As a result of an assessment conducted under that Program, Dr. Himal has agreed not to perform and/or engage in any colonoscopies and flexible sigmoidoscopies.

Dr. Himal shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all his Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Effective September 1, 2016, Dr. Himal will not perform and/or engage in any colonoscopies and flexible sigmoidoscopies. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (3)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 04 Sep 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Harry Sander Himal to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 4, 2024:
 
Following a public complaint, a College investigation was conducted into Dr. Himal’s general surgery practice. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Himal will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for three months.

Dr. Himal will engage in professional education in medical recordkeeping, in appropriate testing and follow-up for patients with gastrointestinal complaints, and in appropriate triaging of patients for sigmoidoscopy and colonoscopy.

Dr. Himal’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision and the completion of the professional education.


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Sep 2016
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:


Source: Member
Effective Date: 01 Sep 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Harry Sander Himal to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective September 1, 2016:

Dr. Himal was the subject of Specified Continuing Education Program. As a result of an assessment conducted under that Program, Dr. Himal has agreed not to perform and/or engage in any colonoscopies and flexible sigmoidoscopies.

Dr. Himal shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all his Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Effective September 1, 2016, Dr. Himal will not perform and/or engage in any colonoscopies and flexible sigmoidoscopies. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”.

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1963

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 05 Oct 2024
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 05 Oct 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 04 Sep 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 19 Aug 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 21 Dec 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Apr 1980
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2024

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 19 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 21 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Apr 1980