THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:49:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YIDDISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 522
Box 58/59
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 591-1222
Fax: (416) 591-1227

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hirsz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Apr 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, YIDDISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 522
Box 58/59
790 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 1N8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 591-1222
Fax: (416) 591-1227

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hirsz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Apr 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABRAHAM ISAAC HIRSZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIRSZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ABRAHAM ISAAC HIRSZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HIRSZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Jun 1975
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 1980

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1975

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1974