THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:50:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 10
100 Highland Road West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 3B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 745-1014
Fax: (519) 745-1015

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 21 May 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 10
100 Highland Road West
Kitchener Ontario N2M 3B5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 745-1014
Fax: (519) 745-1015

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 21 May 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIRJANA GULAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GULAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIRJANA GULAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GULAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1978