THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:57:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 421 Bloor Street East
Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M4W 3T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 920-4200
Fax: (416) 920-4204
Address: 566 Bryne Drive
Barrie Ontario L4N 9E9
Phone: 705 721 1969
Fax: 705721 1859
Address: 18 Wynford Dr.
North York Ontario M3C 3S2
Phone: 416 4430811
Fax: 416 443 0482

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 421 Bloor Street East
Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M4W 3T1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 920-4200
Fax: (416) 920-4204
Address: 566 Bryne Drive
Barrie Ontario L4N 9E9
Phone: 705 721 1969
Fax: 705721 1859
Address: 18 Wynford Dr.
North York Ontario M3C 3S2
Phone: 416 4430811
Fax: 416 443 0482

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1986
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Member
25 Sep 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Member
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 25 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)

As from September 25, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Frederick Hui, in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hui to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of
DR. FREDERICK HUI ("Dr. Hui")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")



A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
public.

(2) I, Dr. Hui, certificate of registration number 31602, am a member of the
College.

(3) I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that following a complaint, the College conducted
an investigation bearing File Number 1101074 (the "Investigation") into
whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my
family and complementary medicine practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Hui, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
effective immediately.

(5) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Hui, undertake that I will cease to engage in the practice
of stem cell therapy.

(6) Posting a Sign

(a) I, Dr. Hui, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting rooms
of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure
location, in the form set out at Appendix "A." For further clarity,
this sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Hui must not engage in the
practice of stem cell therapy. Further information may be found on
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
www.cpso.on.ca".

(b) I, Dr. Hui, undertake to post a certified translation in any
language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
section (6)(a) in all waiting rooms of all my Practice Locations,
in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at
Appendix "A."

(c) I, Dr. Hui, undertake to provide the certified translation
described in section (6)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
of executing this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Hui, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this
Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will
notify the College prior to providing any such services.

(e) I, Dr. Hui, undertake to provide to the College the certified
translation described in section (6)(b) prior to beginning to
provide services in any language described in section (6)(d).

(7) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Hui, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
(collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going
forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all
new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice
at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Hui, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Hui, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
attached hereto as Appendix "B".

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8) I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of
this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
so.

(11) I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to
any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(12) I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee.

(13) I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(14) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following
summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Hui
engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in
his practice of family and complementary medicine. As a
result of the investigation, Dr. Hui must not practise stem
cell therapy.

Dr. Hui shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting
rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows:
"Dr. Hui must not engage in the practice of stem cell
therapy. Further information may be found on the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
www.cpso.on.ca".

D. CONSENT

(15) I, Dr. Hui, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(2 of 2)

As from June 12, 2014, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Frederick Hui, in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hui to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Hui may not engage in the following treatments and/or procedures:

(i) IV colchicine treatment;
(ii) hydrogen peroxide in dosages greater than .0375%;
(iii) epidurals;
(iv) small scale scalpel surgery;
(v) IV antibiotics unless oral antibiotics have been tried and found
not to be successful;
(vi) non-topical silver; and

Dr. Hui shall not prescribe a different conventional medication for a
chronic condition that is being treated by the patient's family
doctor/general practitioner for the chronic condition, unless and until
he has communicated this change with the patient's family doctor/general
practitioner.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)

As from September 25, 2019, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and
limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Frederick Hui, in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hui to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of
DR. FREDERICK HUI ("Dr. Hui")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")



A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
amended;

"Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
public.

(2) I, Dr. Hui, certificate of registration number 31602, am a member of the
College.

(3) I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that following a complaint, the College conducted
an investigation bearing File Number 1101074 (the "Investigation") into
whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my
family and complementary medicine practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Hui, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
effective immediately.

(5) Practice Restrictions

(a) I, Dr. Hui, undertake that I will cease to engage in the practice
of stem cell therapy.

(6) Posting a Sign

(a) I, Dr. Hui, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting rooms
of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure
location, in the form set out at Appendix "A." For further clarity,
this sign shall state as follows: "Dr. Hui must not engage in the
practice of stem cell therapy. Further information may be found on
the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
www.cpso.on.ca".

(b) I, Dr. Hui, undertake to post a certified translation in any
language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
section (6)(a) in all waiting rooms of all my Practice Locations,
in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at
Appendix "A."

(c) I, Dr. Hui, undertake to provide the certified translation
described in section (6)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
of executing this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Hui, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this
Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will
notify the College prior to providing any such services.

(e) I, Dr. Hui, undertake to provide to the College the certified
translation described in section (6)(b) prior to beginning to
provide services in any language described in section (6)(d).

(7) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Hui, undertake to inform the College of each and every
location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
(collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going
forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all
new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice
at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Hui, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Hui, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution
that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
attached hereto as Appendix "B".

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(8) I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in
this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(9) I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of
this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
so.

(11) I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to
any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(12) I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
the Discipline Committee.

(13) I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(14) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Hui, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being
posted in accordance with section (14)(a) above, the following
summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time
period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Hui
engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in
his practice of family and complementary medicine. As a
result of the investigation, Dr. Hui must not practise stem
cell therapy.

Dr. Hui shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting
rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows:
"Dr. Hui must not engage in the practice of stem cell
therapy. Further information may be found on the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
www.cpso.on.ca".

D. CONSENT

(15) I, Dr. Hui, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(2 of 2)

As from June 12, 2014, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Frederick Hui, in
accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Hui to the College of
Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

Dr. Hui may not engage in the following treatments and/or procedures:

(i) IV colchicine treatment;
(ii) hydrogen peroxide in dosages greater than .0375%;
(iii) epidurals;
(iv) small scale scalpel surgery;
(v) IV antibiotics unless oral antibiotics have been tried and found
not to be successful;
(vi) non-topical silver; and

Dr. Hui shall not prescribe a different conventional medication for a
chronic condition that is being treated by the patient's family
doctor/general practitioner for the chronic condition, unless and until
he has communicated this change with the patient's family doctor/general
practitioner.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 25 Sep 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Frederick Hui to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 25, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Hui engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his practice of family and complementary medicine. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Hui must not practise stem cell therapy.

Dr. Hui shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Hui must not engage in the practice of stem cell therapy. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 25 Sep 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Frederick Hui to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 25, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Hui engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his practice of family and complementary medicine. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Hui must not practise stem cell therapy.

Dr. Hui shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Hui must not engage in the practice of stem cell therapy. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca”. 

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 12 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2011
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2011

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1979