THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
27/05/25 19:58:11 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients of Burks Falls Family Health team, please contact them at (705) 382-4020 to access your medical records.
Date Received: 04 Mar 2025

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients of Burks Falls Family Health team, please contact them at (705) 382-4020 to access your medical records.
Date Received: 04 Mar 2025

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 04 Mar 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 30 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 1986

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1984

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jun 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1979