THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:41:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter S. K. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Jan 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter S. K. Chan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Jan 2023

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 17 Apr 2025
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Date: Effective: 07 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1979