THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 05:13:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Madras, 1970
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MALAYALAM, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: c/o Dr. Barbora Pek
1309 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 1C5
Tel: 905-529-6560
Date Received: 04 Nov 2016

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MALAYALAM, TAMIL
Medical School: University of Madras, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: c/o Dr. Barbora Pek
1309 Main Street West
Hamilton ON L8S 1C5
Tel: 905-529-6560
Date Received: 04 Nov 2016

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Madras, 1970

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 15 Sep 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1977