THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:06:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rosedale Medical Centre
Suite 709
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 961-7499
Fax: (416) 961-2050

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Rosedale Medical Centre
Suite 709
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto Ontario M4X 1W4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 961-7499
Fax: (416) 961-2050

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 Dec 1996
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1996
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILSON LEONG LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. WILSON LEONG LEUNG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEUNG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Jun 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 1980

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1979