THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:57:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1975
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Family Medicine Centre
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Fax: (613) 761-4200

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1979
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Family Medicine Centre
210 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 761-4334
Fax: (613) 761-4200

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 01 Nov 1983
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1979
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE CECILE RIVET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVET is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE CECILE RIVET may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVET is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1977
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 1980

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1977

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1976