THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:35:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 1977
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Birmingham, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Birmingham, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jan 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 26 Jan 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1978
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Apr 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 1983

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Aug 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jul 1978