THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 04:44:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1977
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 05 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Date Received: 14 May 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neil Lazar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Aug 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 05 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Toronto General Hospital
University Health Network
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Date Received: 14 May 2019

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Neil Lazar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 15 Aug 2019

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 1977

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 22 Nov 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1980
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2019


DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 1985

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Sep 1980