THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:43:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6204
Fax: (416) 813-7984

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 09 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Coles Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Jul 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 813-6204
Fax: (416) 813-7984

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
Effective: 09 Dec 1982
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Coles Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 25 Jul 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN GORDON COLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN GORDON COLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. COLES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 14 Oct 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jul 1984

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1983

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 1982

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 14 Oct 1982

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1977