THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 04:31:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For medical records or any related inquiries, please contact us by phone at 905-470-7373 or by email at [email protected].
Date Received: 27 Aug 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.K. Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Jul 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: For medical records or any related inquiries, please contact us by phone at 905-470-7373 or by email at [email protected].
Date Received: 27 Aug 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.K. Yeung Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 29 Jul 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 23 Jan 2012
Summary of Decision:
On January 23, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Clement Ka-Chun Yeung committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice, and in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

In 2007, Dr. Yeung disclosed to the College that he had been convicted in the State of Hawaii of charges relating to the dispensing of controlled substances to an undercover agent posing as a patient.

On August 30, 2007, Dr. Yeung plead guilty to knowingly and intentionally distributing and dispensing outside the course of professional medical practice and not for a legitimate medical purpose approximately 1,400 milligrams of Oxycodone on June 14, 2002 and 800 milligrams of Oxycodone on June 21, 2002, in the District of Hawaii.

On both occasions, Dr. Yeung met with an undercover DEA agent, who was known to Dr. Yeung as his patient, Mr. X. Based on his assessment over the course of 20 medical visits over a ten-month period, Dr. Yeung treated Mr. X for chronic back pain with prescription narcotic medication. During the course of treatment, Dr. Yeung took steps to decrease the risks associated with prescribing narcotic medication. On the two occasions in June 2002, Dr. Yeung met Mr. X in a parking lot and prescribed Oxycodone. Mr. X paid Dr. Yeung in cash, since he did not have Health Insurance. Dr. Yeung did not profit beyond receiving money for medical services rendered to Mr. X.

Dr. Yeung provided written prescriptions to Mr. X for dosages and quantities that are within a reasonable range for a patient suffering with chronic back pain.

Dr. Yeung was found guilty of the two counts noted above, and the sentence imposed by the court in Hawaii included that Dr. Yeung: be imprisoned for one year and one day; pay a $10,000.00 fine within 14 days; pay a $200.00 assessment fee; submit to removal proceedings, including deportation or exclusion, as required by the Department of Homeland Security; and surrender his Drug Enforcement Administration controlled substance registration.

Dr. Yeung was incarcerated in Hawaii from January 11, 2008 to November 24, 2008 and was immediately deported from the United States at the conclusion of his incarceration. Dr. Yeung returned to Ontario in December 2008 where he resided until April 2009, at which time he moved to Hong Kong. Dr. Yeung held an unrestricted certificate of registration in Ontario during that period, but elected not to practice medicine in Ontario until the issues surrounding his criminal conviction in Hawaii could be addressed by the College.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. Yeung appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Yeung's certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months, to commence January 23, 2012.

3. the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Yeung's certificate of registration:
(i) that Dr. Yeung shall successfully complete the College's Physician's Prescribing Skills course and shall successfully complete an educational program in Ethics, both no later than one (1) year from the date he commences practice in Ontario;
(ii) that Dr. Yeung shall keep a log of all Narcotics Drugs and Narcotic Preparations prescribed for a period of one (1) year ("Narcotics Log") from the date he commences practice in Ontario;
(iii) that Dr. Yeung shall practice under a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a period of one (1) year from the date he commences practice in Ontario; such supervision shall take place in a setting(s) which is acceptable to the College, and shall consist of, at minimum, monthly reviews of patient charts and of the Narcotics Log for the first three (3) months; and, thereafter, at the discretion of the Clinical Supervisor, quarterly reviews with quarterly reporting to the College throughout the supervision period; and
(iv) that Dr. Yeung will undergo an assessment of his practice, including his narcotics prescribing, approximately one (1) year after the completion of the term of clinical supervision set out in paragraph 3(iii).

4. Dr. Yeung pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): January 23, 2012

Other Notifications (8)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 17 May 2021
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Clement Ka-Chun Yeung to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 17, 2021:

Dr. Yeung has ceased all practice related to Cannabis.

Dr. Yeung must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Yeung is prohibited from practicing in relation to Cannabis, including:

(i) The prescription, dispensing or administration of Cannabis;

(ii) Signing medical documents pursuant to the Cannabis Regulations, SOR/2018-144, or any equivalent documents, or participating in any way in the preparation, issuance or support of Cannabis documents, except for the sole and limited purpose of referring patients to other healthcare providers.

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca 
 


Source: Member
Effective Date: 29 Apr 2021
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Clement Ka-Chun Yeung to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 29, 2021:

Dr. Yeung was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, and incompetence. A College investigation was also commenced into his general practice.

In the face of the above allegations and investigation, effective June 1, 2021, Dr. Yeung resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 17 Feb 2021
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 
 


Source: Member
Effective Date: 01 Jul 2020
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dr. Clement Ka- Chun Yeung to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 1, 2020:

The College has received information regarding Dr. Yeung’s standard of practice and is conducting an investigation into the information. During the investigation, and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Committee:

Dr. Yeung will see no more than 4 patients per hour, for no more than 8 hours per day and no more than 5 days per week.

Dr. Yeung will not conduct house calls.

Dr. Yeung must practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College. 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 08 May 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 08 May 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 08 May 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 


Source: Member
Effective Date: 15 Feb 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Clement Ka-Chun Yeung to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective February 15, 2019:

The College has received information regarding Dr. Yeung's prescribing practice and is conducting an investigation into the information. During the investigation and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Committee:

Dr. Yeung shall not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);
and as amended from time to time.

Dr. Yeung must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as follows:
IMPORTANT NOTICE
Dr. Yeung shall not prescribe or administer any of the following:
- Narcotic Drugs
- Narcotic Preparations
- Controlled Drugs
- Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
- All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Decision: 23 Jan 2012
Summary of Decision:
On January 23, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Clement Ka-Chun Yeung committed an act of professional misconduct, in that he has been found guilty of an offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice, and in that he engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

In 2007, Dr. Yeung disclosed to the College that he had been convicted in the State of Hawaii of charges relating to the dispensing of controlled substances to an undercover agent posing as a patient.

On August 30, 2007, Dr. Yeung plead guilty to knowingly and intentionally distributing and dispensing outside the course of professional medical practice and not for a legitimate medical purpose approximately 1,400 milligrams of Oxycodone on June 14, 2002 and 800 milligrams of Oxycodone on June 21, 2002, in the District of Hawaii.

On both occasions, Dr. Yeung met with an undercover DEA agent, who was known to Dr. Yeung as his patient, Mr. X. Based on his assessment over the course of 20 medical visits over a ten-month period, Dr. Yeung treated Mr. X for chronic back pain with prescription narcotic medication. During the course of treatment, Dr. Yeung took steps to decrease the risks associated with prescribing narcotic medication. On the two occasions in June 2002, Dr. Yeung met Mr. X in a parking lot and prescribed Oxycodone. Mr. X paid Dr. Yeung in cash, since he did not have Health Insurance. Dr. Yeung did not profit beyond receiving money for medical services rendered to Mr. X.

Dr. Yeung provided written prescriptions to Mr. X for dosages and quantities that are within a reasonable range for a patient suffering with chronic back pain.

Dr. Yeung was found guilty of the two counts noted above, and the sentence imposed by the court in Hawaii included that Dr. Yeung: be imprisoned for one year and one day; pay a $10,000.00 fine within 14 days; pay a $200.00 assessment fee; submit to removal proceedings, including deportation or exclusion, as required by the Department of Homeland Security; and surrender his Drug Enforcement Administration controlled substance registration.

Dr. Yeung was incarcerated in Hawaii from January 11, 2008 to November 24, 2008 and was immediately deported from the United States at the conclusion of his incarceration. Dr. Yeung returned to Ontario in December 2008 where he resided until April 2009, at which time he moved to Hong Kong. Dr. Yeung held an unrestricted certificate of registration in Ontario during that period, but elected not to practice medicine in Ontario until the issues surrounding his criminal conviction in Hawaii could be addressed by the College.

The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. Yeung appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Yeung's certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months, to commence January 23, 2012.

3. the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Yeung's certificate of registration:
(i) that Dr. Yeung shall successfully complete the College's Physician's Prescribing Skills course and shall successfully complete an educational program in Ethics, both no later than one (1) year from the date he commences practice in Ontario;
(ii) that Dr. Yeung shall keep a log of all Narcotics Drugs and Narcotic Preparations prescribed for a period of one (1) year ("Narcotics Log") from the date he commences practice in Ontario;
(iii) that Dr. Yeung shall practice under a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for a period of one (1) year from the date he commences practice in Ontario; such supervision shall take place in a setting(s) which is acceptable to the College, and shall consist of, at minimum, monthly reviews of patient charts and of the Narcotics Log for the first three (3) months; and, thereafter, at the discretion of the Clinical Supervisor, quarterly reviews with quarterly reporting to the College throughout the supervision period; and
(iv) that Dr. Yeung will undergo an assessment of his practice, including his narcotics prescribing, approximately one (1) year after the completion of the term of clinical supervision set out in paragraph 3(iii).

4. Dr. Yeung pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order.
 
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): January 23, 2012

Other Notifications (8)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 17 May 2021
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Clement Ka-Chun Yeung to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 17, 2021:

Dr. Yeung has ceased all practice related to Cannabis.

Dr. Yeung must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Dr. Yeung is prohibited from practicing in relation to Cannabis, including:

(i) The prescription, dispensing or administration of Cannabis;

(ii) Signing medical documents pursuant to the Cannabis Regulations, SOR/2018-144, or any equivalent documents, or participating in any way in the preparation, issuance or support of Cannabis documents, except for the sole and limited purpose of referring patients to other healthcare providers.

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca 
 


Source: Member
Effective Date: 29 Apr 2021
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Clement Ka-Chun Yeung to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 29, 2021:

Dr. Yeung was referred to the Discipline Committee on allegations of failing to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct, and incompetence. A College investigation was also commenced into his general practice.

In the face of the above allegations and investigation, effective June 1, 2021, Dr. Yeung resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. 
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 17 Feb 2021
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 
 


Source: Member
Effective Date: 01 Jul 2020
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dr. Clement Ka- Chun Yeung to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 1, 2020:

The College has received information regarding Dr. Yeung’s standard of practice and is conducting an investigation into the information. During the investigation, and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Committee:

Dr. Yeung will see no more than 4 patients per hour, for no more than 8 hours per day and no more than 5 days per week.

Dr. Yeung will not conduct house calls.

Dr. Yeung must practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College. 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 08 May 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 08 May 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 08 May 2019
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 
 


Source: Member
Effective Date: 15 Feb 2019
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Clement Ka-Chun Yeung to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario effective February 15, 2019:

The College has received information regarding Dr. Yeung's prescribing practice and is conducting an investigation into the information. During the investigation and in the event of a referral to the Discipline Committee:

Dr. Yeung shall not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);
and as amended from time to time.

Dr. Yeung must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as follows:
IMPORTANT NOTICE
Dr. Yeung shall not prescribe or administer any of the following:
- Narcotic Drugs
- Narcotic Preparations
- Controlled Drugs
- Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
- All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 17 May 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 18 Nov 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 15 Feb 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 09 Jan 2017
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 23 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 23 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 02 Aug 2002
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1980
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 17 May 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 15 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2017

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2012

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2012
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2012

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Jan 2012

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2002

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 1980