THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:49:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Metro Cardiology
507-5050 Kingsway
Burnaby British Columbia V5H 4C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (604) 439-1277
Fax: (604) 439-1276
Address: Unit B27
Eua Claire Market
Mail Box 182
200 Barclay Parade S W
Calgary Alberta T2P 4R5
Phone: (403) 261-0080
Fax: (403) 261-0016

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Cardiology
Effective: 05 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Metro Cardiology
507-5050 Kingsway
Burnaby British Columbia V5H 4C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (604) 439-1277
Fax: (604) 439-1276
Address: Unit B27
Eua Claire Market
Mail Box 182
200 Barclay Parade S W
Calgary Alberta T2P 4R5
Phone: (403) 261-0080
Fax: (403) 261-0016

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 19 Jun 1985
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Cardiology
Effective: 05 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 1985
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 05 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARY BERNARD BLOOMBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOOMBERG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GARY BERNARD BLOOMBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOOMBERG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Oct 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 1978