THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:47:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 320 - 535 Mullock Dr
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 953-8787
Fax: (905) 953-0330

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 16 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 20 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lossing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 320 - 535 Mullock Dr
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 5H2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 953-8787
Fax: (905) 953-0330

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 16 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
General Surgery
Effective: 20 Nov 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 20 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lossing Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAN GLENN LOSSING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOSSING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAN GLENN LOSSING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOSSING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 1983

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 1982

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1978