THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:58:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1976
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 16 Nov 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Grand Valley Institute for Women
1575 Homer Watson Blvd
Kitchener ON N2P 2C5

Or

80 Waterloo Ave
Guelph ON N1H 0A1
Date Received: 12 Dec 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.J. Ligate Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Mar 2019

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 16 Nov 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 16 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Grand Valley Institute for Women
1575 Homer Watson Blvd
Kitchener ON N2P 2C5

Or

80 Waterloo Ave
Guelph ON N1H 0A1
Date Received: 12 Dec 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L.J. Ligate Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Mar 2019

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 1976
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
No information available

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 18 Dec 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1976