THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:30:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Oxford Medical Sciences Division, 1971
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 13 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 16 May 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan Baxter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Sep 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Oxford Medical Sciences Division, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 13 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 13 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: The Ottawa Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L6
Date Received: 16 May 2018

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan Baxter Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 27 Sep 2017

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Oxford Medical Sciences Division, 1971

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1981
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2018


DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 1981