THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:38:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Clinical Immunology
Effective: 06 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DW Moote Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Mar 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 12 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Clinical Immunology
Effective: 06 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Clinical Immunology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DW Moote Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Mar 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jan 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Apr 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1979