THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:27:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 385 Frederick St # 16
Kitchener ON N2H 2P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-745-7482
Fax: 855-658-1456

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 385 Frederick St # 16
Kitchener ON N2H 2P2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-745-7482
Fax: 855-658-1456

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE ROSEMARY CROWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROWE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANNE ROSEMARY CROWE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROWE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Aug 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 10 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1979