THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:10:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services
1-888-563-3732
www.recordsolutions.ca
Date Received: 01 Nov 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Patey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Oct 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Record Storage and Retrieval Services
1-888-563-3732
www.recordsolutions.ca
Date Received: 01 Nov 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Patey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 07 Oct 2024

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Memorial University of Newfoundland Faculty of Medicine, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 07 Aug 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 28 Sep 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 May 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 1983

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 28 Sep 1981

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 May 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1979