THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:59:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Medical College of Wisconsin, 1973
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Comprehensive Healthcare Network, Cliffwood Plaza
3891 Don Mills Road
Don Mills ON M2H 2S7
Phone: 647-532-7572
Date Received: 27 Apr 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: The Medical College of Wisconsin, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:
Comprehensive Healthcare Network, Cliffwood Plaza
3891 Don Mills Road
Don Mills ON M2H 2S7
Phone: 647-532-7572
Date Received: 27 Apr 2016

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 11 Jul 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Andrew Dillon to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 11, 2016:

Dr. Dillon was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his general medicine practice and whether he engaged in professional misconduct in his use of a physician assistant in a walk-in environment. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Dillon resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

See PDF for full undertaking:

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 11 Jul 2016
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. David Andrew Dillon to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective July 11, 2016:

Dr. Dillon was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his general medicine practice and whether he engaged in professional misconduct in his use of a physician assistant in a walk-in environment. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Dillon resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.

See PDF for full undertaking:

Training

Medical School: The Medical College of Wisconsin, 1973

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2009
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 17 Apr 1997
Suspension of registration imposed: Fitness to Practice Committee Effective: 17 Apr 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 03 Jun 1982
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 24 May 1981
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2009



DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 1997

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Fitness to Practice Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 1996

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 1996
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 1996

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 1986

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 1983
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 1983

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 1983

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jun 1982

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 May 1981