THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 06:40:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1972
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 28 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bernard Stanley Jackson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Feb 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 28 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 28 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bernard Stanley Jackson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Feb 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty of Health Sciences, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Member Deceased Effective: 25 Dec 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 May 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1976
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1975
DETAILS: Expired: Member Deceased
Date: Effective: 25 Dec 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 May 1981

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1979

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1978

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 1977

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 1976

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1976

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 1975