THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
24/05/25 03:57:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165241595
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Cardiology
Effective: 27 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking for copy of their medical records can call Dr. Howard's office at:
Tel: (416) 864-5617
Date Received: 04 Nov 2009

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto Ontario M5B 1W8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4165241595
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Cardiology
Effective: 27 Nov 1979
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 27 1979
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Patients looking for copy of their medical records can call Dr. Howard's office at:
Tel: (416) 864-5617
Date Received: 04 Nov 2009

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES HOWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWARD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT JAMES HOWARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOWARD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1975