THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 04:26:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1975
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 03 Dec 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Sep 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 03 Dec 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 Jun 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 10 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Carette Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 30 Sep 2023

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université Laval Faculté de Médecine, 1975

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Aug 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 06 Jan 1983
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jul 1998

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 1983

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1981