THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:14:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Univ of Singapore, 1972
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Biochemistry
Effective: 03 Dec 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Biochemistry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Date Received: 29 May 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. T.C. and D.S. Ooi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Oct 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Univ of Singapore, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Biochemistry
Effective: 03 Dec 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Biochemistry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 03 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Date Received: 29 May 2017

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. T.C. and D.S. Ooi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 05 Oct 2017

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Univ of Singapore, 1972

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1981

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jun 1981