THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:26:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 402-1081 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-406-3636
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona
USA - California
USA - Indiana
USA - Mississippi
USA - New York
USA - Ohio
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 402-1081 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Y 4G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-406-3636
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Arizona
USA - California
USA - Indiana
USA - Mississippi
USA - New York
USA - Ohio
USA - Virginia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER LEV HERCULES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERCULES is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PETER LEV HERCULES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HERCULES is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Mar 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 05 Jun 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 05 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1980