THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:20:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 86 South Dr
Toronto ON M4W 1R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169625005
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 12 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James H. Oestreicher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Jan 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN
Medical School: McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 86 South Dr
Toronto ON M4W 1R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4169625005
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 12 Nov 1990
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 12 1990
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. James H. Oestreicher Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 06 Jan 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES HERBERT OESTREICHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OESTREICHER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAMES HERBERT OESTREICHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OESTREICHER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980