THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:18:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1979
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 105
3292 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2M 4J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 445-4067
Fax: (416) 445-0206

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Community Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 105
3292 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M2M 4J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 445-4067
Fax: (416) 445-0206

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Community Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 1983
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Community Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 1983
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARLA SHAPIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPIRO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARLA SHAPIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAPIRO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1981
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1981