THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:18:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 280 Queenston Road
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055470509
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Rosedale Medical Group
280 Queenston Road
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1H1
Phone: (905) 547-0508
Fax: (905) 547-6865
Address: 100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3R2
Phone: 905-522-4941
Extension: 39760
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-105 Clappison Avenue
Carlisle Medical Clinic
Hamilton Ontario L8B 0Y2
Phone: 905-689-3301
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 04 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 280 Queenston Road
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1H1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055470509
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Rosedale Medical Group
280 Queenston Road
Hamilton Ontario L8K 1H1
Phone: (905) 547-0508
Fax: (905) 547-6865
Address: 100 West 5th Street
Hamilton Ontario L8P 3R2
Phone: 905-522-4941
Extension: 39760
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1-105 Clappison Avenue
Carlisle Medical Clinic
Hamilton Ontario L8B 0Y2
Phone: 905-689-3301
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 04 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN STANLEY DAVINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVINE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN STANLEY DAVINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVINE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1981
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 1981