THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:10:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1976
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 01 Jan 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical record requests should be submitted to [email protected] or 705-560-6740.
Date Received: 01 Oct 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Schonberger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Schonberger (CPSO#: 32466 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 01 Jan 1981
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Medical record requests should be submitted to [email protected] or 705-560-6740.
Date Received: 01 Oct 2024

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Schonberger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2005
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Schonberger (CPSO#: 32466 )

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 1976

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 16 Apr 2025
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 16 Apr 2025

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 1976