THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:59:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 181 Bay Street
Cleveland Clinic Canada
Executive Health Care
30th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5J 2T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 507 6600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 May 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 22 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan Bell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bell (CPSO#: 32472 )
Business Address: 2830 Keele Street
2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M3M 3E5
(416) 633-6812

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 181 Bay Street
Cleveland Clinic Canada
Executive Health Care
30th Floor
Toronto Ontario M5J 2T3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 507 6600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 May 2009
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 22 2009
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan Bell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2013
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bell (CPSO#: 32472 )
Business Address: 2830 Keele Street
2nd Floor
Toronto Ontario M3M 3E5
(416) 633-6812

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAN DAVID BELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ALAN DAVID BELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980