THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 05:58:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 25 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Dr. Michael J. Weinberg, 247 Queensway West, Mississauga ON L5B 1B9
Tel: (905) 273-3045
Date Received: 11 Apr 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. MTM Rebot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Jun 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 25 Nov 1987
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1987
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Dr. Michael J. Weinberg, 247 Queensway West, Mississauga ON L5B 1B9
Tel: (905) 273-3045
Date Received: 11 Apr 2022

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. MTM Rebot Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 13 Jun 2022

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 12 Apr 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 29 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2022


DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Dec 1987

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 1982

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jun 1980