THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:05:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
10 POWELL Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168226182
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 25 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Electronic medical record at the University Health Network/Princess Margaret Hospital
Date Received: 30 Jun 2022

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Hogg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Aug 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Avenue
10 POWELL Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4168226182
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Hematology
Effective: 25 Nov 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 14 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 14 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Electronic medical record at the University Health Network/Princess Margaret Hospital
Date Received: 30 Jun 2022

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Hogg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Aug 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID HARTWICK HOGG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOGG is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID HARTWICK HOGG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HOGG is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1981

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980