THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:39:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heung Wing Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Nov 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Heung Wing Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Nov 2021

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
04 Mar 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 04 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)

As from February 4, 2020, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Heung-Wing Li in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Li to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. HEUNG-WING LI
("Dr. Li")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

"Discipline Committee" means Discipline Committee of the College;

"ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Li, certificate of registration number 32486, am a member of the College. I acknowledge that I was the subject of an Order of the Discipline Committee dated October 2, 2006, as clarified on April 17, 2007 and as modified by the Divisional Court on July 28, 2008 (the "Discipline Order"), by which, if I wish to re-enter the general practice of medicine, I am required to successfully complete an approved re-entry program including education, training and supervision. As a result, on November 6, 2008, I entered into an undertaking regarding the terms of a re-entry program (my "2008 Re-entry Undertaking"). Pursuant to the 2008 Re-entry Undertaking, I practiced under clinical supervision and underwent a series of assessments of my practice.

(3) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I did not successfully complete an approved re-entry program, and that the College received information regarding my standard of practice through an assessment conducted as part of my re-entry program. As a result, I entered into an undertaking on November 24, 2017 (my "2017 Re-entry Undertaking"), which replaced my 2008 Re-entry Undertaking to establish a new framework for my continued participation in a re-entry program.

(4) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that College considered a reassessment report arising out of my 2017 Re-entry Undertaking which raised concerns about my standard of practice.

(5) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I shall have clinical encounters with male patients only, in compliance with the Discipline Order.

B. UNDERTAKING

(6) I, Dr. Li, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(7) Practice Restriction

(a) I, Dr. Li, undertake to continue to abide by the following restriction from my 2017 Re-entry Undertaking: I shall have clinical interactions with no more than five (5) patients per hour, to a maximum of eight (8) hours per day, except that on one (1) day each week I may have clinical interactions to a maximum of ten (10) hours.

(8) Clinical Supervision

(a) I, Dr. Li, undertake to practice medicine under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for at least three (3) months ("Clinical Supervision").

(b) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:

(i) Facilitate the education program set out in the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as Appendix "B," with a view to preparing me to engage in independent unsupervised practice;

(ii) Review the materials provided by the College and have an initial meeting to discuss the objectives for the Clinical Supervision and practice improvement recommendations;

(iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every month;

(iv) Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every meeting;

(v) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;

(vi) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations;

(vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and

(viii) Submit written reports to the College after three months, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.

(c) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the assessor received June 10, 2019 and addendums dated August 1 and 19, 2019, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

(d) I, Dr. Li, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.

(e) I, Dr. Li, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.

(f) I, Dr. Li, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.

(g) I, Dr. Li, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (8)(e) and/or (f) above, I will cease practicing medicine until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

(h) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that if I am required to cease to engage in the general of medicine as a result of section (8)(g) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.

(9) Professional Education

(a) I, Dr. Li, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

(i) Courses:

1. Successful Patient Interactions, Saegis;

2. PROBE: Ethics & Boundaries Program, by receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without any condition or qualification. I, Dr. Li, undertake to abide by any recommendations of the PROBE program;

(ii) Review and discussion with Clinical Supervisor:

1. Canadian Immunization Guide;

2. The Practice Guide, CPSO;

3. Medical Records, CPSO;

4. Infection Prevention and Control for Clinical Office Practice Document, Provincial Infectious Diseases Advisory Committee (PIDAC);

(iii) Review, reflection, and written summary of:

1. Choosing Wisely Canada - Family Medicine;

(iv) any additional professional education recommended by my Clinical Supervisor.

(b) I, Dr. Li, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c) I, Dr. Li, undertake to complete the courses by the earliest available date and to complete the review, written summary and discussion listed above within three (3) months of signing this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(10) Reassessment of Practice

(a) I, Dr. Li, undertake that, approximately twelve (12) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (8)above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and the completion of the Professional Education set out in section (9) above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors"). I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.

(b) I, Dr. Li, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment.

(d) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.

(11) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Li, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Li, undertake to maintain an up-to-date daily log (the "Patient Log") listing every patient seen by me in my general practice each day, including the patient's name, date of birth, OHIP number, date of appointment or visit, and start and end time of appointment or visit. I undertake to maintain the original Patient Log and to send a copy to the College at the end of every calendar month.

(c) I, Dr. Li, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient records, including the Patient Log and daily appointment book(s), by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Li, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(e) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "C".

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(12) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(13) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(14) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(15) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(16) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

(17) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(18) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (18)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Li engaged in a program to re-enter the general practice of medicine. The College received information which raised concerns about Dr. Li's standard of practice in the course of the re-entry program. As a result:

As of December 3, 2017, Dr. Li will have clinical interactions with no more than five (5) patients per hour, to a maximum of eight (8) hours per day, except that on one (1) day each week he may have clinical interactions to a maximum of ten (10) hours.

Dr. Li will maintain an up-to-date daily log listing every patient seen by him in his general practice each day, including the patient's name, date of birth, OHIP number, date of appointment or visit, and start and end time of appointment or visit.

Dr. Li will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for at least three (3) months.

Dr. Li's practice will be assessed by an assessor selected by the College within 12 months of the end of the Clinical Supervision.

In compliance with an order of the Discipline Committee, Dr. Li will have clinical interactions with male patients only.

D. CONSENT

(19) I, Dr. Li, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and

(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(20) I, Dr. Li, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(21) I, Dr. Li, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking or my 2008 or 2017 Re-entry Undertakings (collectively my "Undertakings");

(b) any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to my Undertakings;

(c) any information relevant to the Reassessment or any Assessment conducted under my Undertakings;

(d) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or

(e) any information which comes to their attention in the course their duties which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

(2of 2)

As from November 26, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Heung-Wing Li in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Li to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. HEUNG-WING LI
("Dr. Li")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

"NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Li, certificate of registration number 32486, am a member of the College. The College has received information regarding my standard of practice.

(3) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that the College has received information regarding my standard of practice through an assessment received as part of a process by which I am seeking to re-enter general practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Li, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) Resignation of Prescribing Privileges

(a) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I have executed the Prescribing Resignation Letter to Health Canada, effective December 3, 2017, which is attached hereto as Schedule "A" (the "Resignation Letter").

(b) I, Dr. Li, consent to the College sending the Resignation Letter to Health Canada on my behalf.

(c) I, Dr. Li, undertake that, as of December 3, 2017, I will not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);

(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto as Schedule "B"; and the current regulatory lists are attached hereto as Schedule "C")

(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in Schedule "D");

and as amended from time to time.

(d) I, Dr. Li, undertake to refer all patients to whom I am prescribing any of the substances described in section (5)(c), above, to other physicians for assessment and care by December 3, 2017.

(e) I, Dr. Li, undertake to keep a log of all patients referred to other physicians pursuant to section (5)(d), above (the "Log"). I, Dr. Li, undertake to include in the Log the name of each patient referred, the name of the physician referred to, and the date of referral.

(6) I, Dr. Li, undertake that I will return any supplies of the substances referred to in section (5)(c) above that are presently in my possession, in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and secure manner, as stipulated in the College's Policy Number 8-12, "Prescribing Drugs."

(7) I, Dr. Li, undertake to inform the College of each and every location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(8) Posting a Sign

(a) I, Dr. Li, undertake that I shall post a sign in the waiting room(s) and in each examination and consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Schedule "E." For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Effective December 3, 2017, Dr. Li has voluntarily agreed not to prescribe or administer any of the following:

-Narcotic Drugs
-Narcotic Preparations
-Controlled Drugs
-Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
-All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

(b) I, Dr. Li, undertake to post a certified translation in any language in which I provide services, of the sign described in section (8)(a) above, in the waiting room(s) and in each examination and consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Schedule "E."

(c) I, Dr. Li, undertake to provide the certified translation(s) described in section (8)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Li, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I will notify the College prior to providing any such services.

(e) I, Dr. Li, undertake to provide to the College the certified translation(s) described in section (8)(c) prior to beginning to provide services in the language(s) described in section (8)(d).

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(9) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(12) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague(s) with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

(13) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

(14) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(15) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

The College received information regarding Dr. Li's standard of practice through an assessment conducted as part of the process by which he sought to re-enter general practice. As a result:

Effective December 3, 2017, Dr. Li has voluntarily agreed not to issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);

(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);

and as amended from time to time.

Dr. Li must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Effective December 3, 2017, Dr. Li has voluntarily agreed not to prescribe or administer any of the following:

-Narcotic Drugs
-Narcotic Preparations
-Controlled Drugs
-Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
-All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

D. CONSENT

(16) I, Dr. Li, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(17) I, Dr. Li, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS, and any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(18) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent forms, attached hereto as Schedule "F" and Schedule "G", respectively.

(19) I, Dr. Li, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1 of 2)

As from February 4, 2020, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Heung-Wing Li in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Li to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. HEUNG-WING LI
("Dr. Li")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

"Discipline Committee" means Discipline Committee of the College;

"ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Li, certificate of registration number 32486, am a member of the College. I acknowledge that I was the subject of an Order of the Discipline Committee dated October 2, 2006, as clarified on April 17, 2007 and as modified by the Divisional Court on July 28, 2008 (the "Discipline Order"), by which, if I wish to re-enter the general practice of medicine, I am required to successfully complete an approved re-entry program including education, training and supervision. As a result, on November 6, 2008, I entered into an undertaking regarding the terms of a re-entry program (my "2008 Re-entry Undertaking"). Pursuant to the 2008 Re-entry Undertaking, I practiced under clinical supervision and underwent a series of assessments of my practice.

(3) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I did not successfully complete an approved re-entry program, and that the College received information regarding my standard of practice through an assessment conducted as part of my re-entry program. As a result, I entered into an undertaking on November 24, 2017 (my "2017 Re-entry Undertaking"), which replaced my 2008 Re-entry Undertaking to establish a new framework for my continued participation in a re-entry program.

(4) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that College considered a reassessment report arising out of my 2017 Re-entry Undertaking which raised concerns about my standard of practice.

(5) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I shall have clinical encounters with male patients only, in compliance with the Discipline Order.

B. UNDERTAKING

(6) I, Dr. Li, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(7) Practice Restriction

(a) I, Dr. Li, undertake to continue to abide by the following restriction from my 2017 Re-entry Undertaking: I shall have clinical interactions with no more than five (5) patients per hour, to a maximum of eight (8) hours per day, except that on one (1) day each week I may have clinical interactions to a maximum of ten (10) hours.

(8) Clinical Supervision

(a) I, Dr. Li, undertake to practice medicine under the guidance of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors acceptable to the College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"), for at least three (3) months ("Clinical Supervision").

(b) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:

(i) Facilitate the education program set out in the Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as Appendix "B," with a view to preparing me to engage in independent unsupervised practice;

(ii) Review the materials provided by the College and have an initial meeting to discuss the objectives for the Clinical Supervision and practice improvement recommendations;

(iii) Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location approved by the College, once every month;

(iv) Review at least fifteen (15) of my patient charts at every meeting;

(v) Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;

(vi) Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and ongoing professional development and inquire into my compliance with the recommendations;

(vii) Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical Supervision; and

(viii) Submit written reports to the College after three months, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has concerns about my standard of practice.

(c) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well as the areas of concern identified in the report of the assessor received June 10, 2019 and addendums dated August 1 and 19, 2019, and concerns that may arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.

(d) I, Dr. Li, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing professional development.

(e) I, Dr. Li, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.

(f) I, Dr. Li, undertake that if a person who has given an undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the College within that time.

(g) I, Dr. Li, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (8)(e) and/or (f) above, I will cease practicing medicine until such time as I have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.

(h) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that if I am required to cease to engage in the general of medicine as a result of section (8)(g) above this will constitute a term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public register.

(9) Professional Education

(a) I, Dr. Li, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

(i) Courses:

1. Successful Patient Interactions, Saegis;

2. PROBE: Ethics & Boundaries Program, by receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without any condition or qualification. I, Dr. Li, undertake to abide by any recommendations of the PROBE program;

(ii) Review and discussion with Clinical Supervisor:

1. Canadian Immunization Guide;

2. The Practice Guide, CPSO;

3. Medical Records, CPSO;

4. Infection Prevention and Control for Clinical Office Practice Document, Provincial Infectious Diseases Advisory Committee (PIDAC);

(iii) Review, reflection, and written summary of:

1. Choosing Wisely Canada - Family Medicine;

(iv) any additional professional education recommended by my Clinical Supervisor.

(b) I, Dr. Li, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c) I, Dr. Li, undertake to complete the courses by the earliest available date and to complete the review, written summary and discussion listed above within three (3) months of signing this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(10) Reassessment of Practice

(a) I, Dr. Li, undertake that, approximately twelve (12) months after the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (8)above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and the completion of the Professional Education set out in section (9) above, I will submit to a reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors"). I acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review of a minimum of fifteen (15) charts, direct observation of my care, interviews with me, colleagues and co-workers, feedback from patients, and any other tools deemed necessary by the College.

(b) I, Dr. Li, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment, conducted under the term of this Undertaking.

(c) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive and review the findings of the Assessor, and may discuss with the Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment.

(d) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and the Reassessment may form the basis of further action by the College.

(11) Monitoring

(a) I, Dr. Li, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b) I, Dr. Li, undertake to maintain an up-to-date daily log (the "Patient Log") listing every patient seen by me in my general practice each day, including the patient's name, date of birth, OHIP number, date of appointment or visit, and start and end time of appointment or visit. I undertake to maintain the original Patient Log and to send a copy to the College at the end of every calendar month.

(c) I, Dr. Li, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient records, including the Patient Log and daily appointment book(s), by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Li, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(e) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "C".

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(12) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(13) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(14) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(15) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(16) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.

(17) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(18) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (18)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

Dr. Li engaged in a program to re-enter the general practice of medicine. The College received information which raised concerns about Dr. Li's standard of practice in the course of the re-entry program. As a result:

As of December 3, 2017, Dr. Li will have clinical interactions with no more than five (5) patients per hour, to a maximum of eight (8) hours per day, except that on one (1) day each week he may have clinical interactions to a maximum of ten (10) hours.

Dr. Li will maintain an up-to-date daily log listing every patient seen by him in his general practice each day, including the patient's name, date of birth, OHIP number, date of appointment or visit, and start and end time of appointment or visit.

Dr. Li will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for at least three (3) months.

Dr. Li's practice will be assessed by an assessor selected by the College within 12 months of the end of the Clinical Supervision.

In compliance with an order of the Discipline Committee, Dr. Li will have clinical interactions with male patients only.

D. CONSENT

(19) I, Dr. Li, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

(a) any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b) any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and

(c) any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(20) I, Dr. Li, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(21) I, Dr. Li, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a) any information relevant to this Undertaking or my 2008 or 2017 Re-entry Undertakings (collectively my "Undertakings");

(b) any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "A" to my Undertakings;

(c) any information relevant to the Reassessment or any Assessment conducted under my Undertakings;

(d) any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or

(e) any information which comes to their attention in the course their duties which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

(2of 2)

As from November 26, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Heung-Wing Li in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Li to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
("Undertaking")

of

DR. HEUNG-WING LI
("Dr. Li")

to

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")

A. PREAMBLE

(1) In this Undertaking:

"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;

"NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended;

"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2) I, Dr. Li, certificate of registration number 32486, am a member of the College. The College has received information regarding my standard of practice.

(3) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that the College has received information regarding my standard of practice through an assessment received as part of a process by which I am seeking to re-enter general practice.

B. UNDERTAKING

(4) I, Dr. Li, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(5) Resignation of Prescribing Privileges

(a) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I have executed the Prescribing Resignation Letter to Health Canada, effective December 3, 2017, which is attached hereto as Schedule "A" (the "Resignation Letter").

(b) I, Dr. Li, consent to the College sending the Resignation Letter to Health Canada on my behalf.

(c) I, Dr. Li, undertake that, as of December 3, 2017, I will not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c.19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);

(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is attached hereto as Schedule "B"; and the current regulatory lists are attached hereto as Schedule "C")

(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22 as noted in Schedule "D");

and as amended from time to time.

(d) I, Dr. Li, undertake to refer all patients to whom I am prescribing any of the substances described in section (5)(c), above, to other physicians for assessment and care by December 3, 2017.

(e) I, Dr. Li, undertake to keep a log of all patients referred to other physicians pursuant to section (5)(d), above (the "Log"). I, Dr. Li, undertake to include in the Log the name of each patient referred, the name of the physician referred to, and the date of referral.

(6) I, Dr. Li, undertake that I will return any supplies of the substances referred to in section (5)(c) above that are presently in my possession, in any place, to a pharmacy in a safe and secure manner, as stipulated in the College's Policy Number 8-12, "Prescribing Drugs."

(7) I, Dr. Li, undertake to inform the College of each and every location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking. Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(8) Posting a Sign

(a) I, Dr. Li, undertake that I shall post a sign in the waiting room(s) and in each examination and consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Schedule "E." For further clarity, this sign shall state as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Effective December 3, 2017, Dr. Li has voluntarily agreed not to prescribe or administer any of the following:

-Narcotic Drugs
-Narcotic Preparations
-Controlled Drugs
-Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
-All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

(b) I, Dr. Li, undertake to post a certified translation in any language in which I provide services, of the sign described in section (8)(a) above, in the waiting room(s) and in each examination and consulting room, in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at Schedule "E."

(c) I, Dr. Li, undertake to provide the certified translation(s) described in section (8)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days of executing this Undertaking.

(d) I, Dr. Li, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I will notify the College prior to providing any such services.

(e) I, Dr. Li, undertake to provide to the College the certified translation(s) described in section (8)(c) prior to beginning to provide services in the language(s) described in section (8)(d).

C. ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(9) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that all schedules attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(10) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking.

(11) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(12) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague(s) with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

(13) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee.

(14) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code.

(15) Public Register

(a) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:

The College received information regarding Dr. Li's standard of practice through an assessment conducted as part of the process by which he sought to re-enter general practice. As a result:

Effective December 3, 2017, Dr. Li has voluntarily agreed not to issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:

(i) Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(ii) Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(iii) Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);

(iv) Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);

(v) All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);

and as amended from time to time.

Dr. Li must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Effective December 3, 2017, Dr. Li has voluntarily agreed not to prescribe or administer any of the following:

-Narcotic Drugs
-Narcotic Preparations
-Controlled Drugs
-Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
-All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

D. CONSENT

(16) I, Dr. Li, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and patient charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems necessary in order to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(17) I, Dr. Li, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, NMS, and any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(18) I, Dr. Li, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS consent forms, attached hereto as Schedule "F" and Schedule "G", respectively.

(19) I, Dr. Li, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Referral or Application: 17 Apr 2025

Past Tribunal Proceedings (5)

Date of Decision: 04 Mar 2024
Summary of Decision:
On March 4, 2024, the Tribunal found that Dr. Li:
  • Failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in relation to completing Accessible Parking Permit applications;
  • Engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration by engaging in clinical encounters with female patients, including in relation to completing Accessible Parking Permit applications for female patients; and
  • Engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by improperly accepting money in exchange for completing Accessible Parking Permit applications.
The Tribunal ordered that:   
  1. Dr. Li attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
  2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Li’s certificate of registration for twelve (12) months commencing March 5, 2024 at 12:01 a.m.; 
  3. the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Li’s certificate of registration; 
  4. Dr. Li pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by April 3, 2024.  
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission and Plea of No Contest, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].  
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Merits, Penalty, Reprimand; March 04, 2024

Date of Decision: 30 Jul 2007
Summary of Decision:
On July 30, 2007, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Li to have committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Committee ordered

1. The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Li's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months. The suspension shall be from today, July 30 until 12:01 a.m. on October 30, 2007.

2. The Discipline Committee directs Dr. Li to appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3. The Discipline Committee orders Dr. Li to pay to the College costs in the amount of $2,500.00 within 30 days of the date of the order

4. The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 30, 2007

Date of Decision: 12 Jan 2006
Summary of Decision:
On January 12, 2006, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Heung-Wing Li committed acts of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and had engaged in conduct that would be regarded by members of the profession as disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional.

On October 2, 2006 and as clarified on April 17, 2007, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. Li shall appear before the Committee to be reprimanded and the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the register.

2. The Registrar suspend Dr. Li's certificate of registration for a period of twenty four months.

The entire period of the suspension to be itself suspended due to the previous thirty four months that Dr. Li has been excluded from practice.

3. Dr. Li complete the College's Boundaries Course within the next twelve months at his
expense.

4. Dr. Li continue in the program of therapy arranged by Dr. X who will provide quarterly reports to the College until Dr. X recommends, and the Registrar agrees, that treatment is no longer necessary. Dr. Li shall ensure that Dr. X executes an undertaking acceptable to the College. If for any reason there is an inability for Dr. X to continue treating Dr. Li, then another psychologist, acceptable to the College, may be substituted.

5. The Registrar impose a term, condition and limitation on Dr. Li's certificate of registration that restricts him to practise as a surgical assistant for at least one year. During this period a physician will be identified in the hospital in which Dr. Li practices who will agree to monitor his performance and behaviour, report to the College every six months and execute an undertaking acceptable to the College.

6. After completion of the College's Boundaries Course and successful completion of therapy with the psychologist, Dr. Li may either continue with a certificate of registration restricted to practise as a surgical assistant or, upon Dr. Li's written request, the Registrar shall impose a permanent term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration that his general practice is confined to male patients only. Dr. Li will have been out of such practice for four years and the Committee therefore orders that, before the imposition of the term, condition and restriction on his certificate restricting his practice to male patients only, Dr. Li must comply with the requirements of the Changing Scope of Practice policy of the College and submit a program of re education, training and supervision to the Registrar. The program must be approved by the Registrar and successfully completed before the issuance of a certificate of registration restricted to male patients only.

On October 30, 2006, Dr. Li appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Divisional Court.

On July 28, 2008, the Divisional Court allowed Dr. Li's appeal regarding the permanent restriction that his general practice is confined to male patients only in paragraph 6 of the Order. The Divisional Court held that the Discipline Committee has no jurisdiction to order a permanent restriction pursuant to its authority under s.51(2)3 to impose a term, condition and limitation for a specified or indefinite period of time and, therefore, set aside this aspect of the Committee's order. The remainder of the Order is in effect, such that upon Dr. Li's written request, the Registrar shall impose a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration that his general practice is confined to male patients only, such term, condition or limitation to remain in effect unless and until varied by the Discipline Committee.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Decision Altered
Appeal Decision Date: 2008-07-28
Hearing Date(s): Sep 26, 2005

Date of Decision: 19 Dec 2002
Summary of Decision:
On December 19, 2002:

1. The Discipline Committee found that Dr. Li committed acts of professional misconduct,

a) under clause 51(1)(b.1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c.18 (the Code) in that he has sexually abused three female patients; and

b) under paragraph 27.29 of Ontario Regulation 448/90 made under the Health Disciplines Act, R.S.O. 1980 (O.Reg. 448) in that he engaged in sexual impropriety with a patient.

2. The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to revoke Dr. Li's certificate of registration, such revocation to take effect immediately.

3. The Discipline Committee requires Dr. Li to attend before this panel to be reprimanded.

4. The Discipline Committee requires Dr. Li to post security satisfactory to the College in the amount of $30,000.00, to be held by the College in trust, to guarantee the payment of any amount the College may pay out in respect of funding for therapy and counselling pursuant to section 85.7 of the Code.

5. The Discipline Committee requires Dr. Li to pay part of the costs to the College, fixed in the amount of $20,000.00.

6. The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.

On January 13, 2003, Dr. Heung-Wing Li filed a notice of appeal to the Division Court, from the findings and decision of the Discipline Committee of December 19, 2002.

On October 1, 2004, the Divisional Court overturned the decision of the Discipline Committee.
Appeal: Decision Overruled
Appeal Decision Date: 2004-10-01
Hearing Date(s): 19 Dec 2002

Date of Decision: 21 Jun 1996
Summary of Decision:
In June 1996, Dr. Li pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, and s. 29(22) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Li guilty of professional misconduct.

Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty:
a) Dr. Li was to appear before this panel of the Committee to be reprimanded on a date to be directed by the panel;

b) Dr. Li s certificate of registration was to be suspended for a period of three (3) months commencing on July 28, 1996;

c) During the term of the aforementioned suspension or at the earliest opportunity following the completion of the suspension, Dr. Li was to comply with the following:

(i) attend and pay for a mentoring programme on breast health and examinations of up to five days in length with a physician specified by the Discipline Committee who is an expert on breast health and breast disease, and who would design a specialized programme for Dr. Li to address his deficiencies in breast examination;

(ii) attend and pay for a three-day communications skills course specified by the Discipline Committee;

(iii) attend and pay for a one-day record-keeping course specified by the Discipline Committee;

(iv) attend and pay for an assessment at the Physician Review and Enhancement Programme (PREP); and

(v) the three courses referred to in items c (i)(ii)(iii) were to have been completed before PREP if practicable.

(vi) complete all remediation that was identified as being required following completion of the PREP assessment; and

(vii) make arrangements to have forwarded to either the Registrar of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario or the Director of Professional Enhancement, or their designates, reports of satisfactory completion of the remedial programmes listed in subparagraphs (i)-(vi) of this section of this Order.

(viii) there was to be a practice inspection by a College inspector two years after completion of the suspension. The results of the inspection were to be satisfactory to the Registrar.

In the event that any of the programmes set out in subparagraph (c) was unavailable for any reason, Dr. Li was to complete a suitable alternative programme within the Province of Ontario to be agreed by Dr. Li and the College, and failing agreement as directed by the Registrar or his designate.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 21, 1996

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 04 Feb 2020
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Heung-Wing Li to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 4, 2020:

Dr. Li engaged in a program to re-enter the general practice of medicine. The College received information which raised concerns about Dr. Li’s standard of practice in the course of the re-entry program. As a result:

As of December 3, 2017, Dr. Li will have clinical interactions with no more than five (5) patients per hour, to a maximum of eight (8) hours per day, except that on one (1) day each week he may have clinical interactions to a maximum of ten (10) hours.

Dr. Li will maintain an up-to-date daily log listing every patient seen by him in his general practice each day, including the patient’s name, date of birth, OHIP number, date of appointment or visit, and start and end time of appointment or visit.

Dr. Li will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for at least three (3) months.

Dr. Li’s practice will be assessed by an assessor selected by the College within 12 months of the end of the Clinical Supervision.

In compliance with an order of the Discipline Committee, Dr. Li will have clinical interactions with male patients only. 


Source: Member
Effective Date: 26 Nov 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Heung-Wing Li to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 26, 2017:

The College received information regarding Dr. Li’s standard of practice through an assessment conducted as part of the process by which he sought to re-enter general practice. As a result:

Effective December 3, 2017, Dr. Li has voluntarily agreed not to issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:

(i)Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(ii)Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(iii)Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
(iv)Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(v)All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);
and as amended from time to time.

Dr. Li must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Effective December 3, 2017, Dr. Li has voluntarily agreed not to prescribe or administer any of the following:
-Narcotic Drugs
-Narcotic Preparations
-Controlled Drugs
-Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
-All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

Current Tribunal Proceedings (1)

Date of Referral or Application: 17 Apr 2025

Past Tribunal Proceedings (5)

Date of Decision: 04 Mar 2024
Summary of Decision:
On March 4, 2024, the Tribunal found that Dr. Li:
  • Failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in relation to completing Accessible Parking Permit applications;
  • Engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and contravened a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration by engaging in clinical encounters with female patients, including in relation to completing Accessible Parking Permit applications for female patients; and
  • Engaged in disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct by improperly accepting money in exchange for completing Accessible Parking Permit applications.
The Tribunal ordered that:   
  1. Dr. Li attend before the panel to be reprimanded; 
  2. the Registrar suspend Dr. Li’s certificate of registration for twelve (12) months commencing March 5, 2024 at 12:01 a.m.; 
  3. the Registrar place terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Li’s certificate of registration; 
  4. Dr. Li pay the College costs in the amount of $6,000 by April 3, 2024.  
More detail can be found in the reasons for decision linked below. OPSDT reasons are also available at www.opsdt.ca and https://www.canlii.org/en/on/onpsdt/. The exhibits, including the Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission and Plea of No Contest, can be obtained by contacting the Tribunal Office at [email protected].  
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): Merits, Penalty, Reprimand; March 04, 2024

Date of Decision: 30 Jul 2007
Summary of Decision:
On July 30, 2007, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Li to have committed an act of professional misconduct in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or acts relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional. The Committee ordered

1. The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Li's certificate of registration for a period of three (3) months. The suspension shall be from today, July 30 until 12:01 a.m. on October 30, 2007.

2. The Discipline Committee directs Dr. Li to appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3. The Discipline Committee orders Dr. Li to pay to the College costs in the amount of $2,500.00 within 30 days of the date of the order

4. The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 30, 2007

Date of Decision: 12 Jan 2006
Summary of Decision:
On January 12, 2006, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Heung-Wing Li committed acts of professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and had engaged in conduct that would be regarded by members of the profession as disgraceful, dishonourable and unprofessional.

On October 2, 2006 and as clarified on April 17, 2007, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1. Dr. Li shall appear before the Committee to be reprimanded and the fact of the reprimand be recorded on the register.

2. The Registrar suspend Dr. Li's certificate of registration for a period of twenty four months.

The entire period of the suspension to be itself suspended due to the previous thirty four months that Dr. Li has been excluded from practice.

3. Dr. Li complete the College's Boundaries Course within the next twelve months at his
expense.

4. Dr. Li continue in the program of therapy arranged by Dr. X who will provide quarterly reports to the College until Dr. X recommends, and the Registrar agrees, that treatment is no longer necessary. Dr. Li shall ensure that Dr. X executes an undertaking acceptable to the College. If for any reason there is an inability for Dr. X to continue treating Dr. Li, then another psychologist, acceptable to the College, may be substituted.

5. The Registrar impose a term, condition and limitation on Dr. Li's certificate of registration that restricts him to practise as a surgical assistant for at least one year. During this period a physician will be identified in the hospital in which Dr. Li practices who will agree to monitor his performance and behaviour, report to the College every six months and execute an undertaking acceptable to the College.

6. After completion of the College's Boundaries Course and successful completion of therapy with the psychologist, Dr. Li may either continue with a certificate of registration restricted to practise as a surgical assistant or, upon Dr. Li's written request, the Registrar shall impose a permanent term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration that his general practice is confined to male patients only. Dr. Li will have been out of such practice for four years and the Committee therefore orders that, before the imposition of the term, condition and restriction on his certificate restricting his practice to male patients only, Dr. Li must comply with the requirements of the Changing Scope of Practice policy of the College and submit a program of re education, training and supervision to the Registrar. The program must be approved by the Registrar and successfully completed before the issuance of a certificate of registration restricted to male patients only.

On October 30, 2006, Dr. Li appealed the decision of the Discipline Committee to the Divisional Court.

On July 28, 2008, the Divisional Court allowed Dr. Li's appeal regarding the permanent restriction that his general practice is confined to male patients only in paragraph 6 of the Order. The Divisional Court held that the Discipline Committee has no jurisdiction to order a permanent restriction pursuant to its authority under s.51(2)3 to impose a term, condition and limitation for a specified or indefinite period of time and, therefore, set aside this aspect of the Committee's order. The remainder of the Order is in effect, such that upon Dr. Li's written request, the Registrar shall impose a term, condition or limitation on his certificate of registration that his general practice is confined to male patients only, such term, condition or limitation to remain in effect unless and until varied by the Discipline Committee.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Decision Altered
Appeal Decision Date: 2008-07-28
Hearing Date(s): Sep 26, 2005

Date of Decision: 19 Dec 2002
Summary of Decision:
On December 19, 2002:

1. The Discipline Committee found that Dr. Li committed acts of professional misconduct,

a) under clause 51(1)(b.1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c.18 (the Code) in that he has sexually abused three female patients; and

b) under paragraph 27.29 of Ontario Regulation 448/90 made under the Health Disciplines Act, R.S.O. 1980 (O.Reg. 448) in that he engaged in sexual impropriety with a patient.

2. The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to revoke Dr. Li's certificate of registration, such revocation to take effect immediately.

3. The Discipline Committee requires Dr. Li to attend before this panel to be reprimanded.

4. The Discipline Committee requires Dr. Li to post security satisfactory to the College in the amount of $30,000.00, to be held by the College in trust, to guarantee the payment of any amount the College may pay out in respect of funding for therapy and counselling pursuant to section 85.7 of the Code.

5. The Discipline Committee requires Dr. Li to pay part of the costs to the College, fixed in the amount of $20,000.00.

6. The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.

On January 13, 2003, Dr. Heung-Wing Li filed a notice of appeal to the Division Court, from the findings and decision of the Discipline Committee of December 19, 2002.

On October 1, 2004, the Divisional Court overturned the decision of the Discipline Committee.
Appeal: Decision Overruled
Appeal Decision Date: 2004-10-01
Hearing Date(s): 19 Dec 2002

Date of Decision: 21 Jun 1996
Summary of Decision:
In June 1996, Dr. Li pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, as defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, and s. 29(22) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended. The Discipline Committee accepted this plea, and found Dr. Li guilty of professional misconduct.

Consequently, the Committee imposed the following penalty:
a) Dr. Li was to appear before this panel of the Committee to be reprimanded on a date to be directed by the panel;

b) Dr. Li s certificate of registration was to be suspended for a period of three (3) months commencing on July 28, 1996;

c) During the term of the aforementioned suspension or at the earliest opportunity following the completion of the suspension, Dr. Li was to comply with the following:

(i) attend and pay for a mentoring programme on breast health and examinations of up to five days in length with a physician specified by the Discipline Committee who is an expert on breast health and breast disease, and who would design a specialized programme for Dr. Li to address his deficiencies in breast examination;

(ii) attend and pay for a three-day communications skills course specified by the Discipline Committee;

(iii) attend and pay for a one-day record-keeping course specified by the Discipline Committee;

(iv) attend and pay for an assessment at the Physician Review and Enhancement Programme (PREP); and

(v) the three courses referred to in items c (i)(ii)(iii) were to have been completed before PREP if practicable.

(vi) complete all remediation that was identified as being required following completion of the PREP assessment; and

(vii) make arrangements to have forwarded to either the Registrar of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario or the Director of Professional Enhancement, or their designates, reports of satisfactory completion of the remedial programmes listed in subparagraphs (i)-(vi) of this section of this Order.

(viii) there was to be a practice inspection by a College inspector two years after completion of the suspension. The results of the inspection were to be satisfactory to the Registrar.

In the event that any of the programmes set out in subparagraph (c) was unavailable for any reason, Dr. Li was to complete a suitable alternative programme within the Province of Ontario to be agreed by Dr. Li and the College, and failing agreement as directed by the Registrar or his designate.
Reasons for Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 21, 1996

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 04 Feb 2020
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Heung-Wing Li to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 4, 2020:

Dr. Li engaged in a program to re-enter the general practice of medicine. The College received information which raised concerns about Dr. Li’s standard of practice in the course of the re-entry program. As a result:

As of December 3, 2017, Dr. Li will have clinical interactions with no more than five (5) patients per hour, to a maximum of eight (8) hours per day, except that on one (1) day each week he may have clinical interactions to a maximum of ten (10) hours.

Dr. Li will maintain an up-to-date daily log listing every patient seen by him in his general practice each day, including the patient’s name, date of birth, OHIP number, date of appointment or visit, and start and end time of appointment or visit.

Dr. Li will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for at least three (3) months.

Dr. Li’s practice will be assessed by an assessor selected by the College within 12 months of the end of the Clinical Supervision.

In compliance with an order of the Discipline Committee, Dr. Li will have clinical interactions with male patients only. 


Source: Member
Effective Date: 26 Nov 2017
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Heung-Wing Li to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 26, 2017:

The College received information regarding Dr. Li’s standard of practice through an assessment conducted as part of the process by which he sought to re-enter general practice. As a result:

Effective December 3, 2017, Dr. Li has voluntarily agreed not to issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer any of the following substances:

(i)Narcotic Drugs (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(ii)Narcotic Preparations (from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(iii)Controlled Drugs (from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27);
(iv)Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances (from the Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19);
(v)All other Monitored Drugs (as defined under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22);
and as amended from time to time.

Dr. Li must post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms and each examination and consulting room, in all Practice Locations, which states as follows:

IMPORTANT NOTICE

Effective December 3, 2017, Dr. Li has voluntarily agreed not to prescribe or administer any of the following:
-Narcotic Drugs
-Narcotic Preparations
-Controlled Drugs
-Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances
-All other Monitored Drugs

Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1979

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. Effective: 05 Mar 2025
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 04 Mar 2025
Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal Effective: 05 Mar 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. Effective: 04 Mar 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 04 Feb 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 24 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 21 Oct 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Member. Effective: 06 Nov 2008
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 30 Oct 2007
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 30 Jul 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee. Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee. Effective: 05 Apr 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2004
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 02 Aug 2002
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 24 Jan 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1999
Suspension of registration removed. Effective: 27 Oct 1996
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 28 Jul 1996
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1981
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal.
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2025

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal.
Date: Effective: 04 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 04 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Member.
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2008

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 30 Oct 2007

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2007

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2006

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee.
Date: Effective: 05 Apr 2005

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 2005
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 2005

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2004

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2002

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee
Date: Effective: 24 Jan 2002

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 1999
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Executive Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Aug 1999

DETAILS: Suspension of registration removed.
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 1996

DETAILS: Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 1996

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 1981