THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 04:03:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 1978
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 52 George St
Box 40
Warkworth ON K0K 3K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-242-5491
Fax: 705-924-2053

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: PO Box 744
Madoc, Ontario K0K 2K0
Date Received: 05 May 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. E. Yorston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Mar 2017

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 52 George St
Box 40
Warkworth ON K0K 3K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-242-5491
Fax: 705-924-2053

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1981
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1981
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: PO Box 744
Madoc, Ontario K0K 2K0
Date Received: 05 May 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. E. Yorston Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Mar 2017

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANET ELIZABETH YORSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YORSTON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JANET ELIZABETH YORSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YORSTON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2020
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 19 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1980
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 1983

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 19 Jun 1982

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1981

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1980

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1978