THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:20:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 15 Apr 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Nelson David Friesen to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 15, 2024:
 
Dr. Friesen was referred to the Discipline Tribunal on allegations of professional misconduct. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Friesen resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 25 Mar 2021
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (2)

Source: Member
Effective Date: 15 Apr 2024
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Nelson David Friesen to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 15, 2024:
 
Dr. Friesen was referred to the Discipline Tribunal on allegations of professional misconduct. In the face of these allegations, Dr. Friesen resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.


Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 25 Mar 2021
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
 

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 1978

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2024
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 1979
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 15 Apr 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 1981

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1979

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 1978