THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:36:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 206-385 Silver Star Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M1V 0E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163213846
Fax: 4163213848
Address: Scarborough Health Network
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 24 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 24 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 206-385 Silver Star Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M1V 0E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4163213846
Fax: 4163213848
Address: Scarborough Health Network
Toronto Ontario M1W 3W3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Critical Care Medicine
Effective: 24 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 24 Nov 2023
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Internal Medicine
Effective: 23 Jun 1986
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Critical Care Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 24 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 23 1986
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID BARRY ROSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DAVID BARRY ROSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980