THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:29:32 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Lakeview Family Health Team
80 Catherine St
Trenton, ON K8V 6N8
Date Received: 01 Dec 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Glenn Griffin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Apr 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 01 Jul 1982
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 1982
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Lakeview Family Health Team
80 Catherine St
Trenton, ON K8V 6N8
Date Received: 01 Dec 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Glenn Griffin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Apr 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 1980

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 28 Oct 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 14 Nov 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1981
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2002

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 1995

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 1981

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 1980