THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:45:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Chile, 1959
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jan 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Please call 416-924-2657
Date Received: 31 Aug 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Chile, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jan 1980
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 1980
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Please call 416-924-2657
Date Received: 31 Aug 2020

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Chile, 1959

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 31 Aug 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1981
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 1981